skip to content

Bourque, Pierre Raymond Joseph

CPSO#: 33489

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Sep 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4777
Fax: (613) 761-5403 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. R. J. Bourque Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bourque ( CPSO# 33489 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
Room C2196 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5353

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PIERRE RAYMOND JOSEPH BOURQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOURQUE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1989
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.