THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:41:46 PM
Tsoukas, Paul Alexander
CPSO#:
120457
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peter Gilgan Centre for Research
686 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5G 0A4
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL ALEXANDER TSOUKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSOUKAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Pediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Pediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Pediatric Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Pediatric Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2020 |