skip to content

O'Connor, Anna Maria

CPSO#: 101149

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nadalini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. O'Connor ( CPSO# 101149)
Dr. M. Nadalini ( CPSO# 27109 )

Business Address:
Villa Leonardo Gambin
40 Fruili Court
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9T3
Phone Number: (416) 617-8461

Business Address:
Villa Colombo Vaughan Di Poce Centre
10443 Highway 27
Kleinburg ON  L0J 1C0
Phone Number: (416) 617-8461


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2019