THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:31:50 AM
Gustafson, Jeffrey Tyler
CPSO#:
118096
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2019
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1460 Idlywild Dr
Clinic
Fort Frances ON P9A 3M3
Phone: 807-274-3131
Fax: 807-274-3855
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2021 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY TYLER GUSTAFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUSTAFSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2021 |