THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:36:56 PM
Southcott, William Peter Matthew
CPSO#:
111188
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Mar 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
481 London Road
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 339-1592
Fax: (519) 491-0680
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - West Virginia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Nov 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM PETER MATTHEW SOUTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTHCOTT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Nov 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 04 Jan 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2023 |