skip to content

Southcott, William Peter Matthew

CPSO#: 111188

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Nov 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: 5193441121 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. Peter Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Southcott ( CPSO# 111188)
Dr. W. Southcott ( CPSO# 29705 )

Business Address:
176 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone Number: (519) 336-4100


Corporation Name: William P.M. Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Southcott ( CPSO# 111188)

Business Address:
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 344-1121


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - West Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2018 Active
             Dr.  William  Peter  Matthew  Southcott  may practise medicine independently in
            family medicine.