THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:03:10 AM
Botsford, Chelsea Elizabeth
CPSO#:
109944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1228 Commissioners Rd W
London ON N6K 1C7
Phone: 519-472-9670
Fax: 519-657-1766
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHELSEA ELIZABETH BOTSFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTSFORD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2018 |