skip to content

Burley, Joshua Paul Baker

CPSO#: 109503

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 69
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M1L0
Phone: 519-482-3000
Fax: 519-482-7648 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Keffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nelson ( CPSO# 55513 )
Dr. L. Jenks ( CPSO# 55667 )
Dr. R. Nugent ( CPSO# 66632 )
Dr. K. Eltawil ( CPSO# 97650 )
Dr. M. Ruppenstein ( CPSO# 98445 )
Dr. S. Elkheir ( CPSO# 98789 )
Dr. M. Halvorsen ( CPSO# 100103)
Dr. V. Patel ( CPSO# 108275)
Dr. J. Burley ( CPSO# 109503)
Dr. C. Botsford ( CPSO# 109944)
Dr. L. Keffer ( CPSO# 111231)

Business Address:
301 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2C1
Phone Number: (807) 274-3287

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Business Address:
1460 Idylwild Drive
RMB 2004 RR#2
Fort Frances ON  P9A 3M3

Business Address:
310 Nelson Street
Fort Frances ON  P9A 1B1
Phone Number: (807) 274-7708

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSHUA PAUL BAKER BURLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2018