THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:00:30 AM
Patel, Vaishali Maheshkumar
CPSO#:
108275
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301 Victoria Ave
Fort Frances ON P9A 2C1
Phone: 8072743287
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
USA - Massachusetts
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Nov 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VAISHALI MAHESHKUMAR PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 Sep 2023 to 18 Feb 2024
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrical Surgical Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2015 |