THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:54:07 AM
Jabs, Doris Kirsten
CPSO#:
70253
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
KHSC
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3020
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DORIS KIRSTEN JABS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |