skip to content

Ortiz Jimenez, Johanna

CPSO#: 120667

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Mar 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Colombia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston Health Science Centre
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. DaBreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. B. Kwan ( CPSO# 97914 )
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 98193 )
Dr. E. Tarulli ( CPSO# 98475 )
Dr. A. Gallo Hoyos ( CPSO# 99262 )
Dr. D. Tampieri ( CPSO# 114793)
Dr. J. Ortiz Jimenez ( CPSO# 120667)

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: J. Ortiz Jimenez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ortiz Jimenez ( CPSO# 120667)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston Health Science Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:19 Mar 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2020 Active
             1.    Dr. Johanna Ortiz Jimenez may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic  Radiology,  Queen's  University,  in  which  Dr.  Ortiz
                        Jimenez  holds  an  academic  appointment  at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Ortiz Jimenez no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Ortiz Jimenez's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes a decision about  Dr.  Ortiz  Jimenez's
                        certificate  of  registration,   following   consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on March 19, 2020, and expires  on  June  30,
                  2023.   Upon  renewal  of  Dr.  Ortiz  Jimenez's  academic appointment at
                  Queen's  University,  the  expiry date can be extended,  subject  to  the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.