skip to content

Chung, Andrew David

CPSO#: 98193

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Feb 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L2V7
Phone: 613-548-2301 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. B. Kwan ( CPSO# 97914 )
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 98193 )
Dr. E. Tarulli ( CPSO# 98475 )
Dr. D. Tampieri ( CPSO# 114793)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775


Corporation Name: Andrew D. Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 98193 )

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7M 9A7
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-5488

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2018