skip to content

de Jesus, Danilo Rocha

CPSO#: 97259

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Feb 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Fed. do Rio Grande do Norte, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Danilo de Jesus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. de Jesus ( CPSO# 97259 )

Business Address:
CAMH
10 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
35 Faircrest Blvd
Kingston ON  K7L 4V1

Business Address:
PO Box 603 Stn Main
Providence Care Hospital
Psychiatry
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 Feb 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 24 Apr 2012
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Feb 2020 Active
 1.    Dr. Danilo Rocha de Jesus may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  Division  of  Adult Psychiatry, Queen's University, in
                        which Dr. de Jesus holds an  academic  appointment  at  the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires seven years  from
                  the date of issuance  or  when  Dr. de Jesus no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating that  Dr.  de  Jesus'
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. de Jesus' certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on February 14, 2020, and expires on June 30,
                  2023.  Upon renewal of Dr. de  Jesus'  academic  appointment  at  Queen's
                  University,  the  expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.