THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:42:45 PM
de Jesus, Danilo Rocha
CPSO#:
97259
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Feb 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Fed. do Rio Grande do Norte, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Feb 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 24 Apr 2012
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Apr 2014
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |