skip to content

Zipursky, Jonathan Samuel

CPSO#: 98463

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dartmouth Medical School, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
E240
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 480-6100 Ext. 3505
Fax: 416 480-6025 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Zipursky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN SAMUEL ZIPURSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIPURSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016