THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 2:42:08 AM
Zipursky, Jonathan Samuel
CPSO#:
98463
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dartmouth Medical School, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology
V1 40
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100
Fax: 416-480-6025
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Zipursky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN SAMUEL ZIPURSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIPURSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |