skip to content

Ziedenberg, Robert Wilfred

CPSO#: 23830

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Cres S Toronto, ON M3J 1X6
Date Received: 09 May 2017


Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017