THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:45:34 AM
Ziedenberg, Robert Wilfred
CPSO#:
23830
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage and Retrieval Services
111 St. Regis Cres S
Toronto, ON M3J 1X6
Date Received: 09 May 2017
Instructions/Address:RSRS Canada
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1979 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |