skip to content

Ziada, Zeinab Hamdy

CPSO#: 92249

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ziada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ziada ( CPSO# 92249 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Suite A10-202
London ON  N6A 5A5


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZEINAB HAMDY ZIADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012