THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:31:40 AM
Ziada, Zeinab Hamdy
CPSO#:
92249
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZEINAB HAMDY ZIADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIADA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2012 |