skip to content

Zarabi, Sarah Farshchi

CPSO#: 98217

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Farshchi Zarabi, Sara (used until: 15 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Shiraz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH FARSHCHI ZARABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016