THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:48:53 PM
Zarabi, Sarah Farshchi
CPSO#:
98217
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Farshchi Zarabi, Sara (used until: 15 Jun 2017 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Shiraz University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058132200
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH FARSHCHI ZARABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARABI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Nov 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2016 |