skip to content

Zanette, Antonella Adriana

CPSO#: 94539

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Luterana do Brasil, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016