THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:31:18 PM
Zanette, Antonella Adriana
CPSO#:
94539
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidade Luterana do Brasil, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |