skip to content

Zalan, Peter Gabor

CPSO#: 24769

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter Zalan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 11 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER GABOR ZALAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZALAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 31 Dec 1981
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 31 Aug 1998 to 20 Sep 1998
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972