THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:32:04 PM
Zalan, Peter Gabor
CPSO#:
24769
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter Zalan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 11 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:18 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 31 Dec 1981
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 31 Aug 1998 to 20 Sep 1998
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2021 |