Zaib, Jehan (CPSO#: 94552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 680-6030
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

algoma Place Health Center
153 S. Algoma St
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 3B7
Canada
Phone: 807-345-5020
Fax: 807-286-2112
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jehan Zaib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zaib ( CPSO# 94552 )

Business Address:
Algoma Place Health Centre
153 South Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 3B7
Phone Number: (807) 345-5020

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6030

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEHAN ZAIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012