THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:45:13 PM
Zaib, Jehan
CPSO#:
94552
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 680-6030
Electoral District: 09
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEHAN ZAIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAIB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2012 |