skip to content

Yusuf, Muhseen Mohamed

CPSO#: 93161

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Russian, Swahili, Urdu

Education:People's Friendship University of Russia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East, Oshawa, ON
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: 905-721-3286
Fax: 905-721-3287 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Muhseen Yusuf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yusuf ( CPSO# 93161 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-3286

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
The Polyclinic, Specialty Department
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Kenya

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:15 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUHSEEN MOHAMED YUSUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUSUF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015