THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:30:37 PM
Yusuf, Muhseen Mohamed
CPSO#:
93161
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Russian, Swahili, Urdu
Education: People's Friendship University of Russia, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON L1J 8P5
Phone: 9057213286
Fax: 9057213287
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kenya
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:15 Aug 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHSEEN MOHAMED YUSUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUSUF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2015 |