skip to content

Yu, Yang

CPSO#: 93338

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:China Medical University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Forest Rd.
Dr. L.A. Miller Center
Public Health and Microbiology Lab
St. John's NL  A1A 3Z9
Phone: (709) 777-8379
Fax: (709) 777-7070

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YANG YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2017