THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:23:34 PM
Yu, Yang
CPSO#:
93338
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: China Medical University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Forest Rd.
Dr. L.A. Miller Center
Public Health and Microbiology Lab
St. John's NL A1A 3Z9
Phone: (709) 777-8379
Fax: (709) 777-7070
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YANG YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Apr 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2017 |