skip to content

Yu, Joseph Wing Cheong

CPSO#: 25767

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. J. Yu Unit 205 1550 South Gateway Road Mississauga, Ontario L4W 5G6
Instructions: Please include your full name, contact number, and if possible a fax number of where the medical records are to be sent
Date Received: 09 Apr 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: May 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Yu voluntarily resigned from the College.