THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:41:35 AM
Yu, Joseph Wing Cheong
CPSO#:
25767
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please include your full name, contact number, and if possible a fax number of where the medical records are to be sent
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. J. Yu
Unit 205
1550 South Gateway Road
Mississauga, Ontario
L4W 5G6
Date Received: 09 Apr 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 31, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Yu voluntarily resigned from the College.