skip to content

Youssef, Hesham Nabil Youssef Ahmed

CPSO#: 87961

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hesham Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Youssef ( CPSO# 87961 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:07 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HESHAM NABIL YOUSSEF AHMED YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Jan 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2019