THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 17:31:28 PM
Youssef, Hesham Nabil Youssef Ahmed
CPSO#:
87961
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HESHAM NABIL YOUSSEF AHMED YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Cardiac Anaesthesia
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Solid Organ Transplantation
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Jan 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Feb 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2019 |