skip to content

Young, Martin Peter

CPSO#: 22751

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 206 94 Francis Street West Fenelon Falls ON K0M 1N0
Date Received: 13 Dec 2017


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: PO Box 639 15 Aneva Court Fenelon Falls, Ontario K0M 1N0
Date Received: 02 Aug 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015