THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:52:08 PM
Young, Martin Peter
CPSO#:
22751
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jun 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite 206
94 Francis Street West
Fenelon Falls ON K0M 1N0
Date Received: 13 Dec 2017
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
PO Box 639
15 Aneva Court
Fenelon Falls, Ontario
K0M 1N0
Date Received: 02 Aug 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2015 |