skip to content

Young, Jennifer Suzanne

CPSO#: 85629

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5128
Fax: (416) 586-8745 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jennifer S. Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Young ( CPSO# 85629 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 588-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Sep 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:13 Sep 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018 Active
             Dr.  Jennifer  Suzanne Young may practise medicine independently in paediatrics
            and neonatal-perinatal medicine.