THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/03/24 21:56:39 PM
Young, Jennifer Suzanne
CPSO#:
85629
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5128
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Sep 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:13 Sep 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2018 |
|
Active |