skip to content

Yew, Dawn Su Ying

CPSO#: 89613

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Solstice Way
Waterloo ON  N2K 0G3
Phone: 519-578-9757
Fax: 519-578-9750 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dawn Yew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Yew ( CPSO# 89613 )

Business Address:
298 Lawrence Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1Y4
Phone Number: (519) 578-9757

Business Address:
100 Solstice Way
Waterloo ON  N2K 0G3
Phone Number: 5195789757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAWN SU YING YEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 14 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2010 to 14 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2011 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012