THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:23:23 AM
Yew, Dawn Su Ying
CPSO#:
89613
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Solstice Way
Waterloo ON N2K 0G3
Phone: 519-578-9757
Fax: 519-578-9750
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Aug 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAWN SU YING YEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 15 Jul 2010 to 14 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 15 Jul 2011 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 15 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2012 |