skip to content

Yegappan, Chidambaram

CPSO#: 89864

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y4E9
Phone: (613)7614169 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 14 2014
Corporation Name: Yegappan Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHIDAMBARAM YEGAPPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEGAPPAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016