THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:34:15 AM
Yegappan, Chidambaram
CPSO#:
89864
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y4E9
Phone: (613)7614169
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHIDAMBARAM YEGAPPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEGAPPAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2016 |