skip to content

Yee, May-Sann

CPSO#: 89829

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Anesthesia / Critical Care Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 1613 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oak Ridges Aesthetic Centre
13291 Yonge St. #401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M.S. Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yee ( CPSO# 89829 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:31 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAY-SANN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008