THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:14:42 AM
Yee, May-Sann
CPSO#:
89829
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Anesthesia / Critical Care Medicine
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 1613
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Aug 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAY-SANN YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2024 to 28 Feb 2025
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |