skip to content

Yan, Peng

CPSO#: 93231

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kensington Eye Institute
Vision & Research Centre - Suit 501
340 College Street
Toronto, Ontario, M5T 3A9
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
7th Floor East Wing Room 401
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peng Yan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yan ( CPSO# 93231 )

Business Address:
2180 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 221
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
109 - 2101 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1S 2B4
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
Vision & Research Centre
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-1335

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PENG YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015