THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 5:09:01 AM
Yan, Peng
CPSO#:
93231
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kensington Eye Institute
Vision & Research Centre - Suit 501
340 College Street
Toronto, Ontario, M5T 3A9
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PENG YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |