skip to content

Yadegari, Andrew Barbod

CPSO#: 87647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew B. Yadegari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yadegari ( CPSO# 87647 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW BARBOD YADEGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YADEGARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 04 Sep 2007 to 28 Sep 2007
EL - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 10 Aug 2009 to 28 Aug 2009
EL - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011