THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:22:21 PM
Yadegari, Andrew Barbod
CPSO#:
87647
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Andrew B. Yadegari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 28 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:03 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW BARBOD YADEGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YADEGARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Sep 2007 to 28 Sep 2007
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 10 Aug 2009 to 28 Aug 2009
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |